+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg
+ − Statute Amended
- 815 ILCS 375/11.1 - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 571.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor