+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Executive Committee; 005-000-001
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ruth Munson
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor