+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 35 ILCS 105/3-55 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.3-55
- 35 ILCS 110/3-45 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.33-45
- 35 ILCS 115/3-5
- 35 ILCS 120/2-5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor