+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 30, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 30, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0207
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Health; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 024-000-000
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2021: HB3025
May 11, 2021: HB3025 - Health
April 15, 2021: HB3025 - Third Reading
March 26, 2021: HB3025 - Appropriations-Human Services
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor