+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 4, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0033
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2018
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
- Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
- Referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe