+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 7, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0134
- Effective Date August 7, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. David Koehler
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Youth and Family Committee; 005-000-000
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Youth and Family Committee
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 18, 2008 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 505/5 - from Ch. 23, par. 5005
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2009: HB0030 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 13, 2009
April 1, 2009: HB0030 - Wednesday, April 01, 2009
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor