+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
On August 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0446
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 23, 2019
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 117-000-000
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-000-000
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Collins
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 012-000-000
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
- Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Public Health
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 005-000-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Requires the Department to collect information that is reported regarding preterm birth, infant mortality, and maternal mortality and to use it to illustrate the disparity of those occurrences across different racial and ethnic groups. Removes a provision that requires hospitals to report that disparity.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (7)
May 30, 2019: SFA0003 - Concurrence
May 27, 2019: SFA0003 - Health Care Availability & Access
May 23, 2019: HB0003 - Third Reading
May 21, 2019: SFA0003 - Public Health
May 14, 2019: HB0003 - Public Health
March 19, 2019: HB0003 - Third Reading
February 5, 2019: HB0003 - Health Care Availability & Access
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor