+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0199
- Effective Date July 27, 2011
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-026-000
- Do Pass Labor; 006-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2011
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011
- Assigned to Labor
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-049-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor Committee; 018-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 6, 2011
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 011-005-000
- Assigned to Labor Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that a project labor agreement shall set forth goals for apprenticeship and total hours to be performed by minorities and females (rather than further public policy objectives as to improved employment opportunities for minorities and females in the construction industry). Provides that a State department, agency, authority, board, or instrumentality that has a project labor agreement in connection with a public works project shall prepare and file with the Department of Labor a quarterly report that includes workforce participation by minorities and females. Provides that the Department of Labor shall submit to the General Assembly and the Governor an annual report that details the number of minorities and females employed under all public labor agreements within the State.