+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
On August 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0391
- Effective Date August 16, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 115-000-000
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 003
Increases the membership on the Task Force from 25 to 28 members. Adds the Director of Children and Family Services or his or her designee, the Department of Juvenile Justice Independent Juvenile Ombudsman, and the Director of the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board to the Task Force.
House Amendment 001
Adds to the membership of the Task Force a representative of an organization that provides independent oversight of correctional facilities appointed by the Governor.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -