+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0098
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
- Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- Referred to Assignments
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 018-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2019: HB2983 - Third Reading
April 30, 2019: HB2983 - State Government
March 29, 2019: HB2983 - Third Reading
March 20, 2019: HB2983 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor