+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/17-1.5 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-43.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-43.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor