+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 14, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0199
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Debbie DeFrancesco Halvorson
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Computer Technology Committee; 007-000-001
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Computer Technology Committee
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2003: HB2972 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2003
March 21, 2003: HB2972 - Third Reading - Friday, March 21, 2003
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor