+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 010-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 220 ILCS 5/2-101 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 2-101
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor