+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/3-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 3-6
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor