+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On January 3, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Vote
November 10, 2015: HB2958 - Executive - Nov 10, 2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor