+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On January 3, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
On November 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Legislative Audit Commission for its FY16 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective immediately.
+ − Vote
November 10, 2015: HB2948 - Executive - Nov 10, 2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor