+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 003-004-000
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor