+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Substance Abuse Special
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling