+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0149
- Effective Date July 26, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
- Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2019: HB2940 - Third Reading
April 30, 2019: HB2940 - State Government
March 27, 2019: HB2940 - Third Reading
March 13, 2019: HB2940 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor