+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Reginald Phillips
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Randy E. Frese
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor