+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Bos
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 35 ILCS 105/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.2
- 35 ILCS 120/1 - from Ch. 120, par. 440
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor