+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-001-000
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2019: HFA0001 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
March 27, 2019: HB2932 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
March 13, 2019: HB2932 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor