+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 002-008-000
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor