+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Provides that the Ombudsman shall not investigate complaints alleging violations of the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that if the Ombudsman determines that a possible violation of the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act has occurred, he or she shall immediately refer the incident to the Office of the Inspector General.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 720 ILCS 5/31-10 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/Art. Ch. III Art. 2.1 heading new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2.1-1 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2.1-5 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2.1-10 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2.1-15 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2.1-20 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2.1-25 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2.1-30 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2.1-35 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2.1-40 new -