+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 13, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0810
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 18, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On May 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 22, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Local Government Committee; 008-000-000
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Tryon
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Local Government Committee
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Tryon
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county board in each county may, upon the affirmative vote of two-thirds of its members, enter into one or more leases for a period of not to exceed 5 years for computer equipment, data processing machinery, and software, as may be required for its corporate purposes.
+ − Statute Amended
- 55 ILCS 5/2-3007 - from Ch. 34, par. 2-3007