+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2006
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; DeLeo
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 27, 2005
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading October 26, 2005
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to December 31, 2005
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a person charged with an offense for which the person, upon conviction, would be subject to registration under the Arsonist Registration Act if the person has previously been convicted of any of the following offenses: (i) arson, (ii) aggravated arson, (iii) residential arson, (iv) place of worship arson, (v) possession of explosives or explosive or incendiary devices, or (vi) an attempt to commit any of these offenses and if the court, after a hearing, determines that the release of the defendant would pose a real and present threat to the physical safety of any person and denial of bail is necessary to prevent fulfillment of that threat, bail may be denied. Establishes procedures for that hearing.
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a person charged with an offense for which the person, upon conviction, would be subject to registration under the Arsonist Registration Act if the person has previously been convicted of any of the following offenses: (i) arson, (ii) aggravated arson, (iii) residential arson, (iv) place of worship arson, (v) possession of explosives or explosive or incendiary devices, or (vi) an attempt to commit any of these offenses and if the court, after a hearing, determines that the release of the defendant would pose a real and present threat to the physical safety of any person and denial of bail is necessary to prevent fulfillment of that threat, bail may be denied. Establishes procedures for that hearing.
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/107-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 107-5