+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/11-1404 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-1404
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor