+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 9, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0057
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
- Assigned to Education
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning the Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services database, requires the State Board of Education, in consultation with the Department of Human Services, through school districts, to provide to parents and guardians of students a copy of the Department of Human Services' guide titled "Understanding PUNS: A Guide to Prioritization for Urgency of Need for Services" each year at the annual review meeting for the student's individualized education program (rather than requiring the State Board of Education, in consultation with the Department of Human Services, to inform parents and guardians of students through school districts about the Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services waiting list). Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Removes the requirement that a school district provide written notification concerning Supplemental Security Income and a special-needs trust. Provides that a school district must provide the written notification concerning the Prioritization of Urgency of Need for Services database to the parent or guardian at the initial meeting between the school district and the parent or guardian to develop the student's individualized education program and once a year thereafter at a regularly scheduled individualized education program meeting (rather than no later than 30 days following the implementation of the initial individualized education program and once a year thereafter). Requires a school district to provide to the parent or guardian of a student with an individualized education program a copy of the Department of Human Services' guide titled "Understanding PUNS". Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/14-17 new
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.163