+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 28, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor