+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0267
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 22, 2017
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
- Do Pass Education; 010-000-000
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
- First Reading
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-001-000
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo