+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0070
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 016-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Mental Health Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Removes language referring to a specific grant available under the federal 21st Century Cures Act.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 16, 2019: HB2897 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB2897 - Public Health
April 9, 2019: HB2897 - Third Reading
March 21, 2019: HB2897 - Mental Health
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor