+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0273
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
- Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Public Health
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-004-000
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2019: HB2896 - Third Reading
May 14, 2019: HB2896 - Public Health
March 27, 2019: HB2896 - Third Reading
March 6, 2019: HB2896 - Health Care Licenses
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor