+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 215 ILCS 5/367m
- 225 ILCS 150/5
- 225 ILCS 150/15
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5.25
- 325 ILCS 20/3 - from Ch. 23, par. 4153
- 325 ILCS 20/3b new
- 325 ILCS 20/11 - from Ch. 23, par. 4161
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor