+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0390
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 012-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
- Postponed - Public Health
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
- Postponed - Public Health
- Assigned to Public Health
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 004-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 006-000-000
- Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall ensure that all birthing facilities conduct continuing education yearly for providers and staff of obstetric medicine and of the emergency department and other staff that may care for pregnant or postpartum women. Requires the continuing education to include yearly educational modules regarding management of severe maternal hypertension and obstetric hemorrhage for units that care for pregnant or postpartum women. Requires birthing facilities to demonstrate compliance with the education and training requirements. Provides that the Department shall collaborate with the Illinois Perinatal Quality Collaborative or its successor organization to develop an initiative to improve birth equity and reduce peripartum racial and ethnic disparities. Provides that the Department shall support the initiation of a statewide perinatal quality improvement initiative. Provides that the Department shall make available to all birthing facilities best practices for timely identification of all pregnant and postpartum women in the emergency department and for appropriate and timely consultation of an obstetric provider to provide input on management and follow-up. Effective January 1, 2020.
House Amendment 001
Provides that the Department of Public Health shall ensure that all hospitals require all current and new obstetrical staff, emergency department staff, and any other staff, including residents and fellows in training, who provide care for pregnant or postpartum women to receive implicit bias training and education in cultural competency in interactions between patients and providers. Provides that the Department shall provide support for the Illinois Perinatal Quality Collaborative to develop an initiative to improve birth equity and reduce peripartum racial and ethnic disparities, modeled using the Alliance for Innovation on Maternal Health and the California Maternal Quality Collaborative's pilot work on improving birth equity. Provides that the Department shall support the initiation of a statewide perinatal quality improvement initiative in collaboration with Illinois birthing hospitals to implement strategies to reduce peripartum racial and ethnic disparities and to address implicit bias in the health care system. Provides that the Department shall ensure that all hospitals develop protocols for timely identification of all pregnant and postpartum women in the emergency department and for appropriate and timely consultation of an obstetric provider to provide input on management and follow up.