+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Reported Back To Executive Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Executive Committee; 004-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- To Gaming Subcommittee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- To Gaming Subcommittee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- To Gaming Subcommittee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Requires organization licensees and inter-track wagering location licensees to deposit 50% (rather than 47%) of their share of the net terminal income from video gaming into the horsemen purse accounts associated with their respective race track (rather than race track to be distributed by agreements between breeds unless the organization licensee and the horsemen associations representing the largest number of owners, trainers, jockeys, or standardbred drivers who race horses at that organization licensee's racing meetings agree to allocate expenses associated with the video gaming terminals). Provides that at a race track located in Cook County that races multiple breeds, the share of net terminal income deposited into the horsemen purse account shall be distributed equally among the breeds unless the organization licensee and the horsemen associations representing the largest number of owners, trainers, jockeys, or standardbred drivers who race horses at that organization licensee's racing meetings agree to a different distribution.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 230 ILCS 40/5 -
- 230 ILCS 40/25 -
- 230 ILCS 40/30 -
- 230 ILCS 40/35 -
- 230 ILCS 40/45 -
- 230 ILCS 40/55 -
- 230 ILCS 40/58 -
- 230 ILCS 40/60 -
- 720 ILCS 5/28-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 28-1