+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 40 ILCS 5/7-154 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-154
- 40 ILCS 5/7-222 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-222
- 30 ILCS 805/8.35 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor