+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 013-003-000
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 415 ILCS 5/3.330 - was 415 ILCS 5/3.32
- 415 ILCS 5/3.336 new -
- 415 ILCS 5/3.366 new -
- 415 ILCS 5/3.535 - was 415 ILCS 5/3.53
- 415 ILCS 5/9.4 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1009.4
- 415 ILCS 5/22.16b - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1022.16b
- 415 ILCS 5/47.5 new -