+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0143
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 010-000-000
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2007
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-001-000
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that a person of the age of 17 years and upwards commits the offense of indecent solicitation of a child if the person knowingly discusses an act of sexual conduct or sexual penetration with a child or with one whom he or she believes to be a child by means of the Internet with the intent that the offense of aggravated criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse be committed. Provides that it is not a defense that the person did not solicit the child to perform sexual conduct or sexual penetration with the person. Provides that a violation of this provision is a Class 4 felony.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/11-16 - from Ch. 38, par. 11-16
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2007: HB2858 - Third Reading - Friday, May 18, 2007
April 20, 2007: HB2858 - Third Reading - Friday, April 20, 2007
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor