+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police shall establish a pilot program under which Internet Gang Crime Units shall be created in the Cook County Sheriff's Office, the Vermilion County Sheriff's Office, and the Village of Round Lake Heights Police Department. Provides for allocation of the moneys available under the pilot program. Provides that the Internet Gang Crime Units shall investigate criminal activities of organized gangs that involve the use of the Internet. Provides that peace officers in each Internet Gang Crime Unit shall have extra-jurisdictional authority to conduct investigations and make arrests anywhere in the State of Illinois regarding criminal activities of organized gangs that involve the use of the Internet. Contains provisions concerning seizures, forfeitures, and reports. Provides that the pilot program shall terminate on July 1, 2010. Makes a corresponding change in the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Effective July 1, 2007.
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police shall establish a pilot program under which Internet Gang Crime Units shall be created in the Cook County Sheriff's Office, the Vermilion County Sheriff's Office, and the Village of Round Lake Heights Police Department. Provides for allocation of the moneys available under the pilot program. Provides that the Internet Gang Crime Units shall investigate criminal activities of organized gangs that involve the use of the Internet. Provides that peace officers in each Internet Gang Crime Unit shall have extra-jurisdictional authority to conduct investigations and make arrests anywhere in the State of Illinois regarding criminal activities of organized gangs that involve the use of the Internet. Contains provisions concerning seizures, forfeitures, and reports. Provides that the pilot program shall terminate on July 1, 2010. Makes a corresponding change in the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Effective July 1, 2007.
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/2-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 2-5