+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0487
- Effective Date August 23, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
- Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-010-000
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Provides that the State Treasurer is authorized to acquire (currently, purchase) real property located in Springfield, Illinois. Provides that real property acquired by the State Treasurer under specified provisions may be acquired subject to any third party interests in the property that do not prevent the State Treasurer from exercising the intended beneficial use of such property. Removes provisions concerning the form in which property may be acquired by the State Treasurer. Removes provisions concerning a leaseback of property. Modifies the term "operational expenses of the Office of the State Treasurer".
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 15 ILCS 505/35 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.12 - from Ch. 127, par. 144.12