+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (68)
On August 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0486
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 1, 2020
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-008-001
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Note Filed as Amended
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Corrections Budget and Impact Note Filed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-002-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Note Filed
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Balance Budget Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Budget & Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Grant Wehrli
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 015-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
- Do Pass Labor; 015-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-005-000
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Visitation Rights Act. Provides that employees may use school visitation privileges for purposes of academic and behavioral meetings in addition to school conferences. Provides that an employee may not be terminated for the use of school visitation privileges. Effect August 1, 2020.
House Amendment 002
Provides that an employer may not terminate an employee for an absence from work if the absence is due to the employee's attendance at a school conference, behavioral meeting, or academic meeting (rather than a school conference or activity).
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 30, 2019: SFA0001 - Concurrence
May 24, 2019: SFA0001 - Labor & Commerce
May 21, 2019: HB2830 - Third Reading
May 15, 2019: SFA0001 - Labor
May 1, 2019: HB2830 - Labor
April 3, 2019: HB2830 - Third Reading
March 27, 2019: HB2830 - Labor & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor