+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0864
- Effective Date August 22, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConnaughay
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sheri Jesiel
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 011-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2015
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sheri Jesiel
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the engrossed bill, and makes the following changes: (1) adds to the membership of the Task Force a representative of the Chicago Regional Human Trafficking Task Force, appointed by the Governor, and the Director of the Department of State Police, or his or her designee; (2) provides that the Department of Children and Family Services (instead of the Department of Human Services) shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force; (3) provides that the Task Force shall report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2017 (instead of June 30, 2016); and (4) provides that the Act is repealed and the Task Force is abolished on July 1, 2017 (instead of July 1, 2016). Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill, and makes changes regarding the composition and duties of the task force. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -