+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 25, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0380
- Effective Date August 25, 2017
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
- Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond