+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 805/2-6 - from Ch. 122, par. 102-6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor