+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen