+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 010-006-000
- Reported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 003-002-000
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- To Ballot Access Subcommittee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Silvana Tabares
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2017: HB2806 - Ballott Access Subcommittee
March 30, 2017: HB2806 - Elections & Campaign Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor