+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/1-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1-1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor