+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2006
- Arrive in Senate
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-005-000
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 025-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack McGuire
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 022-000-000
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 3, 2006
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jack McGuire
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes language pertaining to new vehicle dealers. Provides that, for used vehicle dealers that were not in business the previous year, the annual cost of a license shall be $1,000 for the applicant's primary place of business and $100 for each additional place of business, if any. Provides that, if the license application is made after June 15 of any year, the license fee shall be $500 for the applicant's primary place of business and $50 for each additional place of business, if any.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/5-101 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 5-101
- 625 ILCS 5/5-102 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 5-102