+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 16, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0185
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2007
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 23, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 5 ILCS 120/2 - from Ch. 102, par. 42
- 15 ILCS 405/22.2 - from Ch. 15, par. 222.2
- 20 ILCS 405/405-130 - was 20 ILCS 405/67.28