+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 20, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0445
- Effective Date August 20, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
- Arrive in Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper